Sign up now
to enroll in courses, follow best educators, interact with the community and track your progress.
Download
How to multiply numbers faster (Part 1): Vedic Mathematics
9,233 plays

More
Here, Utkarsh has covered some tricks for doing faster multiplication. He has also covered, in depth, multiplication using identities and base method of multiplication.

Utkarsh Ujjwal
A third year undergraduate at IIT Guwahati.. A NTSE scholar, KVPY fellow, multi Olympiad winner and a Mathematics lover at heart..

U
Unacademy user
Good Praseena ,keep going
Praseena
a year ago
Thank you 😊
eg 3 how it's 12 after cross addition
pls upload addition n subtraction of vedic maths
It is not apply to 88 * 99.
Its not working for 29 and 12 please tell me
sir I m sure it tricks and all..are gonna help a lot but I want u to realise that if u are making video for others to understand (not necessarily iitians.) plz speak like viewer is listening and he has faith...plz don't just speak .. let the people understand u... araam se apni bat samjhaye...plz Na ki bas bol k khatam kare...thank u
Utkarsh Ujjwal
3 years ago
Thanks for the feedback Shubham. I have tried to explain more in my next courses. :)
that's so nice of you. thank u sir
  1. LEARN THE TRICKS OF VEDIC MATHS How to multiply numbers faster (Part 1) How to muliply numbers faster (Part ) By UTKARSH UJUWAL


  2. About me: Sophomore at IIT Guwahati Qualified IIT JEE 2015 Qualified NTSE, KVPY (Both stages) A Mathematics lover Doubt/ Query/ Feedback in comments+ Share Course Fee: CONTRIBUTE Follow me on https://unacademy.in/user/UtkarshUjjwal on https:/unacademyinhiserUit s://unacadem.in/user/ Utkarsh


  3. Contribute: If this course is helping you in any way, you are free to pay a voluntary professional fee by clicking on the 'CONTRIBUTE ' button.


  4. Multiplication using identities Distributive property . a x (b + c) (a x b) + (ax c) 11 x 26 = 26 x (10 +1)-260 + 26 = 286 7 x 212 = 7 x (200 + 12) = 1400 + 84 = 1484 180x15= 180 x (10+5) = 1800+900-2700 .


  5. (a + b) x (a-b)=a2-b2 + ab-ab b- a a2 b Eg:85 x 25 = (30 + 5) x (80-5)-302-52 . = 900-25 = 875 * "If b = 1 then ?? 31 x 29 k a 302-1 = 900-1 899


  6. Multiplication of numbers (BASE METHOD) 10: Eg: 6 x 8 P 6 (-4) . Base 1. Multiply right column numbers 2. Add the diagonal numbers (-4) x (-2)-8 and 64(-2)-84 (-4) = 4 8 (-2) X (-2)8 an


  7. Eg 2: 14x 16 14 +4 16 +6 14 x 16 224 20 +2 4


  8. Eg 3: 14x 8 14 04 08 (-2) 12 (-8) 14x8=120+(-8) = 112


  9. . Base 100: Eg: 105 x 101 105 05 101 01 Base = 100 has two zeroes, so 05 106 / 05 105 x 101 = 10605


  10. Eg: 104 x 93 104 04 93 (-7) 97 /(-28) 104 x 93- 9700+ (-28) 9672