Sign up now
to enroll in courses, follow best educators, interact with the community and track your progress.
Download
Develop smart observation skills: Vedic Mathematics
12,584 plays

More
In this lesson, Utkarsh has taught some smart observational tricks that can lead you to the correct answer in no time.

Utkarsh Ujjwal
A third year undergraduate at IIT Guwahati.. A NTSE scholar, KVPY fellow, multi Olympiad winner and a Mathematics lover at heart..

U
Unacademy user
sir, plz can you explain all the 16 sutra and 13 aub sutra of vadic mathematics
AF
inspired by Roman sir i believe
RR
how would one multiply which are not close to any base which is power of 10. for example 65*48
DV
Very Interesting and Helpful for all the Students! For CAT Preparation for MBA :- http://www.jeduka.com/articles-updates/cat/cat-2016-optimize-your-preparation-simple-tips
  1. LEARN THE TRICKS OF VEDIC MATHS Develop smart observation skills By UTKARSH UJUWAL


  2. About me: Sophomore at IIT Guwahati Qualified IIT JEE 2015 Qualified NTSE, KVPY (Both stages) A Mathematics lover Doubt/ Query/ Feedback in comments+ Share Course Fee: CONTRIBUTE Follow me on https://unacademy.in/user/UtkarshUjjwal on https:/unacademyinhiserUit s://unacadem.in/user/ Utkarsh


  3. Contribute: If this course is helping you in any way, you are free to pay a voluntary professional fee by clicking on the 'CONTRIBUTE ' button.


  4. Smart observation skills??? How would you approach these problems (109 + 100-3) = 206 (41x100) /4-1025 (12 x 1000) /8 = 1500 (30/ 8) /10 = 0.375 109 + 97 => 41x25 12 x 125 => 3/8->


  5. A few things to observe beforehand 5-(10/2) .25 (100/4) 125= (10008) 625 (10000/16)


  6. How to use 123 x 5 = (123 x 10) / 2-1230/2-615 84 x 25 = (84 x 100) / 4 8400/4= 2100 32 x 1 25 = (32 x 1000) / 8 = 32000/8 = 4000


  7. Similar technigue for division 3424/50= (3424 x 2) / 100-6848/100 = 68.48 . 37/25- (37 x 4)/100 148/100 1.48 4/13- (4 x 10)/13)/10 (40/13)/10 3.076/10-0.3076


  8. How to actually develop fast calculation skills Don't use calculator for every calculation. Try it first in your mind and then check if you aren't sure Always look for the easiest approach to calculate. Most of the calculations can be done without using pen Be as creative as you can with calculations Remember squares up to 30 and cubes up to 10