Sign up now
to enroll in courses, follow best educators, interact with the community and track your progress.
Download
Addition of Two Digits Number: Part 1 (in Hindi)
6,095 plays

More
Addition of Two Digits Number: Part 1 (in Hindi) In this amazing course, you will learn all tricks for fast Calculation and you will be able to calculate without using pen and paper. Then, let us start. All the best. "Math Dikhta Hai"In this amazing course, you will learn all tricks for fast Calculation and you will be able to calculate without using pen and paper. Then, let us start. All the best. "Math Dikhta Hai"

Amar Sir is teaching live on Unacademy Plus

Amar Sir
Teaching with a unique way 'Math Dikhta Hai', developed over 24 years. Taught 50k+ students with 5k+ positive results

U
Unacademy user
sir, please provide this in english also
sir ek request hai ki daily kitna time dena hai exam ki preparation ke liye
WITH MY UNACADEMY SUBSCRIPTION GET ONE MONTH FREE USE CODE- PLUSACCQP
  1. A renowned faculty of Objective Mathematics, Personal Interview/GD, General Studies, Indian History An experience of 24 yrs of teaching at Jamshedpur, Ranchi, Bokaro [Jharkhand], Sambalpur [Odisha]. Thousands of successful students in Bank/SSC/Railway/Civil Services 4 1275 163K 1.1M Courses Lessons Followers Life time views Amar Sir Math Dikhta Hai" https://unacademy.com/user/amar.singh963


  2. Bank/SSC/Railwav Fast Calculation Tricks unacademy Amar Sir "Math Dikhta Hai"


  3. Bank/SSC/Railwav Fast Calculation Tricks unacademy Amar Sir "Math Dikhta Hai"


  4. Bank/SSC/Railway/IAS Mathematics Fast Calculation Tricks


  5. Fast Calculation Tricks 1. Sum of a two digit no. and its digits interchanged 2. Difference between a two digit number and its 3. Sum and Differences of a two digit number and its no. digits interchanged number digits interchanged number


  6. 1. Sum of a two digit no. and its digits interchanged no. (1) 24+ 42 11 x (2 +4)-11 x 6 66 (2) 54 + 45 = 11 x (5 + 4) = 11 x 9-99 (3) 37+ 73 11 x (3 7)-11 x 10 110 (4) 29 +92 11 x (2 +9) 11 x 11 121 (5) 49 + 94-11 x (4+9) 11 x 13 143


  7. 1. Sum of a two digit no. and its digits interchanged no. (6) 86 + 68 = 11 x (8 + 6) = 11 x 14-154 (7) 96-69-11 x (9+6) = 11 x 15=165 (8) 75 + 57-11x(7 + 5) = 11 x 12-132 (9) 89 + 98-11 x (8 + 9) = 11 x 17-187


  8. 2. Difference between a two digit no. and its digits interchanged no. (1) 42-24-98(4-2)=982-18 (2) 73 -37-9 x (7-3) 9 x 4-36 (3) 94 -49 9 x (9-4) 9 x 5 45 (4) 86-68=98(8-6) = 9 x 2-18 (5) 52-25 9 x (5 -2)-9 x 3 27


  9. 2. Difference between a two digit no. and its digits interchanged no. (6) 69 -96 9 x (6- 9) 9 x (-3)27 (7) 48-84-98(4-8) = 9 x (-4)--36 (8) 79-97 9 x (7-9) 9 x (-2)--18 (9) 38 -83-9 x (3 - 8)-9 x (-5)--45


  10. 1. Application : Sum of a two digit no. and its digits interchanged no 1. (i) 68 + 86+ 74+47 +59 +95 62 + 26 (a) 571 (b)417 (c) 517 (d) 571 (e) none of these 11 47= 517 Ans.


  11. 2. Application: Difference between a two digit number and its digits interchanged number 2. (ii) 58 -85- 64 +46-79 +97 + 42 - 24 (a) 9 (b) -19 (c)-9 (d) 90 (e) none of these Sol.: 9 x [-3 -2 +2 21 9 x -1--9 Ans.


  12. 3. Application: Sum and Differences of a two digit no. and its digits interchanged no. 3. (i) 68 -86 + 74 +47 +59+95 62 - 26 (a) 312 (b) 325 (c) 293 (d) 229 (e)none of these Sol.: 9x [-2+41 +11 x + 11 14] -9 x 21 +11 x [ 25] - 18 + 275 293 Ans.


  13. Fast Calculation Tricks 1. Square of a number having 5 at the unit's place 2. Product of two numbers having 5 at the unit's places


  14. 2. (i) Product of two numbers having 5 at the unit's places (i) 35 x 45 = [(3x5) x100 + 25] + 1x50 = 1575 (4-3) (ii) 45 x 65 = [(4x7) 100 + 25] + 2x50 = 2925 (6-4) (iii) 55 x 85 = [(5x9) x100 + 251+3x50 = 4675 (8-5)


  15. 2. (ii) Product of two numbers having 5 at the unit's places (iv) 65 x 95 = [(6x10) x100 + 25] + 3x50 = 6175 6 10 (9-6) (v) 45 x 85 -[(4x9) x100 25 4x50-3825 (8-4) (vi) 75 x 105- [(7x11) X100 +25] +3x50- 7875 7 11 (10-7)


  16. 1. (i) Square of a number made of ones only Since No. of one-2 = Maximum no.] (i) 12321 [Since No. of one-3-Maximum nol (iii) 1111-1234321 [Since No. of one-4=Maximum no]


  17. 1. (ii) Square of a number made of ones only 123454321 [Since No. of one 5Maximum nol (i1-1234567654321 Since No. of one- 7-Maximum no]


  18. 2. (i) Product of two numbers made of ones only (i) 11 x 1111221


  19. 2. (ii) Product of two numbers made of ones only (vi) 111x1111-123321


  20. Bank/SSC/Railwav Fast Calculation Tricks unacademy Amar Sir "Math Dikhta Hai"


  21. Multiplication of a no. by a no. made of ones only .2423 x 11- 26653 Ans. 21342x 111-2368962 Ans. .21342 x 1111 23710962 Ans.


  22. 1. Multiplication of any no. by 11 1. (vii) 906 11 = 9966 Ans. [(9, 9+0, 0+6, 6) - (9,9,6,6)-(9966)] (viii) 789 11= 8679 Ans. [(7, 7+8, 8+9, 9) -(8, 6, 7, 9)-(8679)]


  23. 1. Multiplication of any no. by 11 1. (ix) 2438 x 11-26818 Ans. [(2, 2+4, 4+3, 3+8, 8) -(2, 6, 8,1, 8)-(26818)] (x) 3586 x 11 39446 Ans. [(3, 3+5, 5+8, 8+6, 6) -(3, 9, 4, 4, 6) -(39446)]


  24. 2. Multiplication of a no. by 111 2. (i) 234 x 111 -25974 Ans. [(2, 2+3, 2+3+4, 3+4, 4) -(2, 5, 9, 7, 4) (25974)] (ii) 542x111-60162 Ans. [(5, 5+4, 5+4+2,4+2,2) (6, 0, 1, 6, 2) (60162)]


  25. 2. Multiplication of a no. by 111 2. (vii) 9008 x 111 999888 Ans. [(9, 9+0,9+0+0, 0+0+8, 0+8, 8) -(9, 9, 9, 8, 8, 8)-(999888)] (viii)16234 x 111 1801974 Ans. 0l 1:000 62323434,41 0 0.13.1. 4)-(1801974)]


  26. 2. Multiplication of a no. by 111 2 (ix) 94 111 = 9990444 Ans. [(9, 9+0, 9+0+0, 0+0+0, 0+0+4, 0+4, 4) 0002 (9, 9, 9, 0, 4, 4, 4)-(9990444)


  27. MULTIPLICATION OF TWO NUMBERS HAVING THE BASE 100 102 +2 104+4 106 08 106, 08 Ans. 97 |-3 94-6 9T-118 91, 18 Ans.


  28. MULTIPLICATION OF TWO NUMBERS HAVING THE BASE 1000 992 -8 996-44 1004 +4 1009+9 1013 036988 032 1013, 036 Ans. 988, 032 Ans.


  29. SQUARES OF NUMBERS HAVING THE BASE 100 6. 112? = 7. 1132 = 8. 1162 = 9. 1172 = (112 + 12) x 100 + (12)-125, 44 (113 + 13) x 100+ (13)2 = 127, 69 (116 + 16) x 100 + (16)2 = 134, 56 (117 + 17) x 100 + (17)-136, 89


  30. SOUARES OF NUMBERS HAVING THE BASE 1000 1. 10022- (1002 + 2) x 1000 +22 1004,004 2. 10032 = (1003 + 3) x 1000 + 32 = 1006,009 3. 10042 (1004 + 4) x 1000 42 1008,016 4. 10052 (1005 + 5) x 1000 + 52 = 1010.025 5. 10082 (1008 + 8) x 1000 + 82-1016,064


  31. SOUARES OF NUMBERS HAVING THE BASE 1000 1.9992 = (999-1) x 1000 + 12 = 998,001 2.9982 (998-2) x 1000 22 996,004 3.9972 (997-3) x 1000 + 32 = 994,009 4.9962- (996-4) x 1000 +42-992,016 5. 9952- (995-5) x 1000 +52990,025


  32. U ARES OF NUMBERS HAVING THE BASE 1000 6. 9942- (994 - 6) x 1000 +62-988,036 7.993-(993-7) x 1000 + 72 986,049 8. 9922- (992 -8) x 1000 + 82-984,064 9.9912- (991 - 9) x 1000 + 92 - 982,081


  33. Multiplication of two numbers having the Base 100 102 x 105-[(102+5) 100 + (2x5)] = 1 071 0 103 x 109 = [(103+9) x100+ (3x9)] = 11227 104 x 107 = [(104+7) x 100 + (4x7)] = 11128 102 108 = (102+8) x100+ (2x8)] = 11016 101 x 109 /(101+9) x100+ (1x9)-11009


  34. Multiplication of two numbers having the Base 100 88 x 94-[(88-6) x100+ (-12x-6)] = 8272 87 x 98-[(87-2) x100+ (-13x-2)-8526 82 97-[(82-3) x100+ (-18x-3)] = 7954 89 x 92- [(89-8) x100 + (-11x-8)]-8188


  35. Multiplication of two numbers having the Base 1000 989x993-[(989-7) x1000+(-11 x-7)]-982,077 988x999 1(988-1)x1000 + (-12x-1)1- 987,012 975x992- [(975-8)x1000 + (-25x-8)1-967,200


  36. Multiplication of two numbers above and below the bases 100 and 1000 +8 -6 108x94- 101, 52 +12 -3 112x97- 108, 64 +9 -7 +15 -11 1009x993-1001, 937 1015x989- 1003, 835


  37. Fast Calculation Tricks Base rule Half Base Full base: 10, 100. 1000.10000,... Half base: 5, 50.500, 5000,...


  38. MULTIPLICATION OF TWO NUMBERS ABOVE AND BELOW THE BASE 500 509 +9 492 -8 504 252 000501 250 500 5061-6 498-2 2 122 2 -72 251 988 Ans. 250 428


  39. SQUARES OF NUMBERS HAVING THE BASE 50 (4) 542-I54 4)+ 2) x 1001 +42 (5) 55-[{(55 + 5) 2} x 1001 + 52 (6) 562 = [{(56 + 6) 2} x 1001 + 62 - [29 x 100] + 16-29, 16 - [30 x 100] + 25-30, 25 - [31 x 100] + 36 -31, 306


  40. SQUARES OF NUMBERS HAVING THE BASE 50 (4) 462 = 1(46-4) 2} x 1001 + 42 (5) 49-[{(45-5) 2} x 1001 + 52 (6) 44 = [ {(44-6) 2} x 1001 + 62 = 21 x 1001 + 16 = 21,16 120 x 1001 25-20.25 -[19 x 100] + 36-19,36


  41. SQUARES OF NUMBERS HAVING THE BASE 500 (1) 5012-I(501 1) +2) x 1000] + 12 251 x 10001 + 001 = 251.001 (2) 5022-10502 + 2) 2} x 10001 + 22 - [252 x 1000] + 004-252,004 (3) 5032- [(503 +3) + 2} x 1000] + 32 253 x 10001 + 009 = 253,009


  42. SQUARES OF NUMBERS HAVING THE BASE 500 (10) 5102-1510+ 10) 2} x 10001 + 102 - [260 x 1000] + 100-260,100 (11) 5112-1511+ 11) 2} x 10001 + 112 = 261 x 10001 + 121 = 261,121 (12) 512 = K512+ 12) 2} x 10001 +122 - [262 x 1000] + 144-262,144


  43. MULTIPLICATION OF TWO NUMBERS ABOVE AND BELOW THE BASE 500 509 +9 492 -8 504 252 000 501 250 500 -72 506+6 498-2 -12 2 251988 Ans. 250 |428


  44. Bank/SSC/Railwav Fast Calculation Tricks unacademy Amar Sir "Math Dikhta Hai"


  45. MULTIPLICATION OFANUMBER BY 5 28 5 = 280 2 140 36 5 = 360 2-180 64 5 640 2-320 -47 5 = 470 2 = 235


  46. MULTIPLICATION OFANUMBER 28 50 36 50 64 50 -47 50 BY 50 2800 2 = 1400 3600 2 = 1800 6400 2 = 3200 4700 2 2350


  47. MULTIPLICATION OFANUMBER BY 500 28 500 28000 2-14000 36 x 500 = 36000 2-18000 64 500 64000 2 = 32000 -47 500 = 47000 2 = 23500


  48. DIVISION OF A NUMBER BY 5 275 54 10- 5.4 48+5=96 10 = 9.6 645 128+10 12.8 925 18410-18.4


  49. Multiplication oftwo numbers having digits Digits at the Unit places is 10 34 36 = [(3 4):100 + (4 6)] 1224 48 x 42 [(4x5) x100 + (8x2)]- 2016 53 x 57 (5x6) x100 (3x7)1 3021 61 x 69 = [(6x7) x100 + (1x9)] = 4209 72 x 78 = [(7x8) x100 + (2x8)] = 5616 81 x 89-[(8x9) 100 + (1x9)]-7209 43 x 47 (4x5) x100 + (3x7)] = 20211 74 76 [(7X8) x100 + (4x6)]-5624 92 98 [(9x10) x 100 + (2X8)]-9016 103 107-[(10x11) 100+ (3x7)]= 11021


  50. One Line Multivlication Multiplication ofa three digit no. by a two digit no. 436 X 24 243 574 47 10242624 1223193 22434012 38648518 26696728 354 x 63 469 x 82 x 51 36 43 x24 x24 436 X24 10 10242624 1st step 2"d step 3rd step 4th step Ans. 1st step 2nd step3rd step th step


  51. One Line Multiplication Multiplication of a four digit no. by a two digit no. 2436 23 6354 x 53 2469 5243 41 3574 x 37 x 12. 516202218 211419163 3336373612 1737577618 134262632!8